Numbers 4800-4899

A page of the Numeropedia - the Special Encyclopedia of Numbers

[1K…) * [2K…) * [3K…) * [4K…) * [5K…) * [6K…) * [7K…) * [8K…) *  [9K…)  & [10K] & [100K]

1  - 10 - 100  - 1000 - 10,000 - 100,000 - 1M - 10M - 100M1B10B - 100B - 1T - 10T - 100T - 1Q - ...

4,800

[Tech.]  One of standardized baud rate (bits per second) in electronic data transmissions.

4,818

[Geology]  The highest railway point in the world, at Ticlio Pass, Peru: 4818 meters/15806 feet. (As of 2005, China is building a railway connection between Golmud and Lhasa that will cross a mountain pass at 5072 meters, 16644 feet).

4,832

[Math.]  The number 4832 and 48322 = 23,348,224 has the same digits.

4,840

[Measure]  The number of square yards in an acre.

U.S. customary units for area measures: 1 acre = 160 square rods = 4,840 square yards = 43,560 square feet = 6,272,640 square inches = 4046.8564224 m2 & 1 square mile (1 section) = 640 acres = 2,589,988.11 m2 = 2.59 km2 = 259 hectares & 1 hectare = 2.471 acres = 10,000 m2 & 1 township = 36 square miles.

4,851

[Math.]  A triangular number (sum of all integers from 1 to 98): 4851 = 1+2+…+97+98.

[Math.]

7,683,984 = 1584×4851 = 27722

782432784 = 15984×48951 = 279722

78384320784 = 159984×489951 = 2799722

7839843200784 = 1599984×4899951 = 27999722

783998432000784 = 15999984×48999951 = 279999722

7839…9984320000784 = 159…999984×489…999951 = 279…9999722...

4,860

[Geology]  The length (miles, 7820 km, kilometers) of the longest highway in the world: Trans-Canada Highway, from Vancouver Island, British Columbia, to St. John’s, Newfoundland.

[Math.]  Sum (in degrees) of all internal angles of a 29-side polygon.

4,862

[Math.]  A Catalan number: C9 = 4862.

4,869

[Math.]  Two multiples of 4869, 4869×3 = 14,607 and 4869×8 = 38,952, use each of 10 digits 0-9 once.

4,879

[Math.]  48792 = 23,804,641 = (238+04641)2.

4,884

[Math.]

 66×64 = 4224 66×67 = 4422 66×68 = 4488 66×69 = 4554 66×74 = 4884

 666×661 = 440,226 666×666 = 443,556 666×669 = 445,554 666×672 = 447,552 666×663 = 441,558 666×667 = 444,222 666×670 = 446,220 666×674 = 448,884 666×664 = 442,224 666×668 = 444,888 666×671 = 446,886 666×675 = 449,550

… (generalizable pattern) …

4,893

[Math.]  Two multiples of number 4893, 4893×2 = 9,786 and 4893×7 = 34,251, use each of 9 digits 1-9 once.