4,609

[Math.]  4,609 = 4444+66+0+99.

 

4,619

[Math.]  Two multiples of number 4619, 4619×4 = 18,476 and 4619×5 = 23,095, use each of 10 digits 0-9 once.

 

4,624

[Math.]  4624 = 44+46+42+44.

 

4,641

[Math.]  6,794,424 = 2652×2562 = 1464×4641.

 

4,644

[Math.]  Two multiples of number 4644, 4644×7 = 32,508 and 4644×9 = 41,796, use each of 10 digits 0-9 once.

 

4,649

[Math.]  1,111,111 = 239×4649.

 

4,653

[Math.]  Each ratio 17658/2943 = 27918/4653 = 34182/5697 = 6, using each of 9 digits 1-9 once, shows how to arrange a 9-book set on 2 shelves to mark the book #6.

 

4,656

[Math.]  A triangular number (sum of all integers from 1 to 96): 4465 = 1+2+…+95+96.

 

4,660

[Math.]  4660 (decimal) = 0x1234 (hexadecimal).

 

4,676

[Math.]  4676 = 14+24+34+44+54+64+74.

 

4,680

[Math.]  Sum (in degrees) of all internal angles of a 28-side polygon.

 

4,683

[Math.]  18,095,112 = 6762×2676 = 4683×3864.

 

4,689

[Math.]  The ratio 37512/4689 = 8, using each of 9 digits 1-9 once, shows how to arrange a 9-book set on 2 shelves to mark the book #8.

 

4,691

[Math.]  The ratio 37528/4691 = 8, using each of 9 digits 1-9 once, shows how to arrange a 9-book set on 2 shelves to mark the book #8.